Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463957

EP3463957 - ELECTRICAL SYSTEM OF A RAIL VEHICLE, RAIL VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ELECTRICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bombardier Transportation GmbH
Schöneberger Ufer 1
10785 Berlin / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / FALKE, Ewald
Salisstraße 7
9000 St. Gallen / CH
02 / RICKERMANN, André
Kirschgartenweg 14
5600 Lenzburg / CH
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17726307.629.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62910
Priority number, dateDE20161020955301.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016209553
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207498
Date:07.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463957
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60K1/00, B61C3/00, B60L3/00, B60L11/18, B60K8/00, B60R21/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES SYSTEM EINES SCHIENENFAHRZEUGS, SCHIENENFAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES ELEKTRISCHEN SYSTEMS[2019/15]
English:ELECTRICAL SYSTEM OF A RAIL VEHICLE, RAIL VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ELECTRICAL SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE, VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTÈME ÉLECTRIQUE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase09.11.2018National basic fee paid 
09.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
09.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]EP0514580  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7,9-13 * the whole document * [A] 5,6;
 [YA]EP1958843  (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7,9-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0076]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0055] * [A] 5,6,8;
 [Y]DE102009008549  (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7,9-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0070]; figure 5 *
by applicantWO2007031245