Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469739

EP3469739 - SUBSEA OPTICAL COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / VUSIRIKALA, Vijayanand
4202 Ruthelma Ave.
Palo Alto CA 94306 / US
02 / KAMALOV, Valey
1127 SW 79th Terrace
Gainesville FL 32607 / US
03 / KOLEY, Bikash
1550 Norland Dr.
Sunnyvale CA 94087 / US
04 / HOFMEISTER, Ralph
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View CA 94043 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17726429.817.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US33082
Priority number, dateUS20161517749109.06.2016         Original published format: US201615177491
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213813
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469739
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/077, H04B10/079, H04B10/80, H04J14/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:OPTISCHES UNTERWASSERKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ[2019/16]
English:SUBSEA OPTICAL COMMUNICATION NETWORK[2019/16]
French:RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION OPTIQUE SOUS-MARIN[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2018National basic fee paid 
04.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
04.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]EP2765712  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0065] * * figures 1-4, 6 * [Y] 6-9,14-29 [I] 2-5,11-13;
 [Y]US2007253718  (MAGRI ROBERTO [IT], et al) [Y] 6-9,14-29 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] *;
 [A]US2008304825  (MAHONY GLENN MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * figures 6, 7 *
 [A]  - VERBRUGGE S ET AL, "General availability model for multilayer transport networks", DESIGN OF RELIABLE COMMUNICATION NETWORKS, 2005. (DRCN 2005). PROCEEDI NGS.5TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON ISLAND OF ISCHIA, ITALY OCT. 16-19, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051016), doi:10.1109/DRCN.2005.1563848, ISBN 978-0-7803-9439-1, pages 85 - 92, XP010868538 [A] 3,4,7,11,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DRCN.2005.1563848