Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468681

EP3468681 - SPECTATOR MANAGEMENT AT VIEW LOCATIONS IN VIRTUAL REALITY ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc.
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MARKS, Richard
2207 Bridgepointe Parkway
San Mateo CA 94404 / US
02 / OSMAN, Steven
2207 Bridgepointe Parkway
San Mateo CA 94404 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17726456.118.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US33392
Priority number, dateUS201662349587P13.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349587 P
US20161528306930.09.2016         Original published format: US201615283069
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218137
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468681
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/26, A63F13/211, A63F13/213, A63F13/5255, A63F13/86, A63F13/212
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ZUSCHAUERVERWALTUNG AN SICHTSTELLEN IN UMGEBUNGEN DER VIRTUELLEN REALITÄT[2019/16]
English:SPECTATOR MANAGEMENT AT VIEW LOCATIONS IN VIRTUAL REALITY ENVIRONMENTS[2019/16]
French:GESTION DE SPECTATEUR AU NIVEAU D'EMPLACEMENTS DE VUE DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS DE RÉALITÉ VIRTUELLE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2012249416  (MACIOCCI GIULIANO [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0099] * * figures 3, 4 *;
 [A]US2013342564  (KINNEBREW PETER TOBIAS [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0114] * * figure 11 *;
 [A]US2014125698  (LATTA STEPHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0002] * * figure 4 *