Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464517

EP3464517 - PRODUCTION OF UPGRADED EXTRACT AND RAFFINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / UMANSKY, Benjamin, S.
12766 Alder Woods Drive
Fairfax, VA 22033 / US
02 / ALDOUS, Keith, K.
4130 West Crown Cresting Drive
Montgomery, TX 77316 / US
03 / GLEESON, James, W.
12631 Mostyn Lane
Magnolia, TX 77354 / US
04 / BLOK, Edward, J.
610 N. Commons View Drive
Huffman, TX 77336 / US
05 / DEMMIN, Richard, A.
424 Dennison Street
Highland Park, NJ 08904 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17726473.619.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US33505
Priority number, dateUS201662341167P25.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662341167 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205200
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464517
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:C10G67/04
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG VON AUFGEWERTETEM EXTRAKT UND RAFFINAT[2019/15]
English:PRODUCTION OF UPGRADED EXTRACT AND RAFFINATE[2019/15]
French:PRODUCTION D'EXTRAIT ET DE RAFFINAT AFFINÉS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
18.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US4770763  (KUSAYANAGI SAMPO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-6,12,17 * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 13; table 1 * [I] 7-11,13-16,18-20;
 [I]US5925234  (MOREL FREDERIC [FR] ET AL) [I] 1-20 * column 11, line 43 - column 12, line 27 *;
 [I]GB2037806  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [I] 1-20 * page 1, lines 14-48; claims 1,4 *;
 [I]US2013062256  (KOSEOGLU OMER REFA [SA]) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0080] , [0081] , [0096]; claim 1 *