Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465565

EP3465565 - VALIDATION OF MULTI-COMPONENT DESIGN CONSTRAINTS FOR CAPITAL PROJECT DESIGN SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hexagon Technology Center GmbH
Heinrich-Wild-Strasse 201
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MANTRARATNAM, Venkata N. P.
113 Mill Ridge Dr.
Madison, Alabama 35758 / US
02 / SHAIK, Jealani P.
111 Shamrock Dr.
Madison, Alabama 35758 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Kaminski Harmann
Patentanwälte AG
Landstrasse 124
9490 Vaduz / LI
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17726512.122.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US33825
Priority number, dateUS20161516382525.05.2016         Original published format: US201615163825
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205283
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465565
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/06, G06Q50/04, G06Q50/06
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VALIDIERUNG VON MEHRKOMPONENTIGEN PLANUNGSBESCHRÄNKUNGEN FÜR KAPITALPROJEKTPLANUNGSSYSTEM[2019/15]
English:VALIDATION OF MULTI-COMPONENT DESIGN CONSTRAINTS FOR CAPITAL PROJECT DESIGN SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:VALIDATION DE CONTRAINTES DE CONCEPTION À COMPOSANTS MULTIPLES DESTINÉE À UN SYSTÈME DE CONCEPTION DE PROJET DE CAPITAL[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2018National basic fee paid 
22.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
22.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2015066442  (PRYOR ADAM [AU]) [I] 1-26 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0168] - paragraph [0170] * * figure 1 *;
 [I]WO2013019961  (DESIGN PLAY TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-26 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0130] * * paragraph [0197] - paragraph [0211] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [I]US2016132805  (DELACOURT FREDERIK CHRISTOPHE [US], et al) [I] 1-26 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0257] - paragraph [0262] * * figures 2,16 *;
 [I]US2014032426  (TOZZI CHRISTINE MARGARET [US]) [I] 1-26 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0111] * * figures 1,2,4,8,9 *