Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463699

EP3463699 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING INDUSTRIALLY PRODUCED COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hemo GmbH
Gewerbestrasse 38
75015 Bretten-Gölshausen / DE
For all designated states
EMO Oberflächentechnik GmbH
Gewerbestraße 38
75015 Bretten / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HÖSEL, Volker
Zipserstraße 12
75181 Pforzheim / DE
02 / HÖSEL, Peter
Eulenweg 8
75181 Pforzheim / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4
76135 Karlsruhe / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17726614.529.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62888
Priority number, dateDE20161010986130.05.2016         Original published format: DE102016109861
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207486
Date:07.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463699
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B08B3/04, B08B3/08, B08B3/10, B08B3/12, C11D7/50, C11D11/00, C23G5/02, C23G5/024, C23G5/04, C23G5/06
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON INDUSTRIELL GEFERTIGTEN TEILEN[2019/15]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING INDUSTRIALLY PRODUCED COMPONENTS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE NETTOYAGE DE PIÈCES FABRIQUÉES INDUSTRIELLEMENT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2018National basic fee paid 
17.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
17.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US5716458  (MACHINO KATSUYA [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-12,21,25 * column 1, lines 7-16 * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 63 * * column 5, line 29 - column 8, line 57 * * column 12, line 38 - column 15, line 40 * * column 22, line 60 - column 26, line 54 * * column 31, lines 44-50; figures 1,5 * [Y] 15 [I] 9,18,22-24;
 [XI]DE4329178  (EMO OBERFLAECHENTECH GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,13,14,16,17,20,21,23,25,26 * column 1, line 3 - column 7, line 45; figure 1; claims 1-10 * [I] 24;
 [XYI]DE4314365  (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6,10-12,18,20 * page 2, line 3 - page 5, line 19; claims 1-12; tables 1,2 * [Y] 13 [I] 19,21,26;
 [X]WO0050555  (WACK O K CHEMIE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,11,20 * page 1, line 4/5 * * page 3, line 10/11 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 13; claims 1-11 *;
 [YA]US2015000709  (DUCASSE ALEXANDRE [US]) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0002]; figures 1,2; claims 1-13 * [A] 1,21;
 [YA]DE19714603  (SCHWARZ ERNST MAFAC GMBH [DE]) [Y] 15 * column 1, lines 41-45; figures 1-3 * * column 2, lines 16-19 * * column 3, lines 61-68 * * column 4, lines 25-29 * * column 4, lines 41-44 * [A] 1,21