Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469292

EP3469292 - HEAT EXCHANGER AND SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Technology GmbH
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / RENALS, Stephen Michael
25 Danny Trail
Vernon CT 06066 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 04 61
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Katzka, Catherine
GE International Inc.
Global Patent Operation - Europe The Ark, 201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date17726617.829.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP62939
Priority number, dateUS20161517905310.06.2016         Original published format: US201615179053
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211613
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469292
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F28F9/26, F28D7/08, F28F9/18, B23P15/26, B21D53/06, F22B21/02, B23K101/14, F28D21/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:WÄRMETAUSCHER UND SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES WÄRMETAUSCHERS[2019/16]
English:HEAT EXCHANGER AND SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A HEAT EXCHANGER[2019/16]
French:ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
10.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2010065159  (HARTWIG RUBEN [DE] ET AL) [I] 1-18,20 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0025]; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]GB1402719  (FOSTER WHEELER BROWN BOILERS) [X] 19 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]CH649374  (SCHLATTER AG) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *