Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471999

EP3471999 - MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HEIMRATH, Michael
Tonwerkstr. 15
82256 Fuerstenfeldbruck / DE
02 / KÖGEL, Tobias
Kleeweg 12
85375 Neufahrn / DE
 [2019/17]
Application number, filing date17726857.017.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP61788
Priority number, dateDE20161021071816.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016210718
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215868
Date:21.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471999
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60Q1/00, B60Q9/00, G01S17/93, G01S15/93, G01S13/93
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2019/17]
English:MOTOR VEHICLE[2019/17]
French:VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
09.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US5426571  (JONES JERRY [US]) [X] 1,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4-7,9,10 [I] 3;
 [Y]DE2742271  (SEV MARCHAL) [Y] 2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE60204534T  (VALEO VISION [FR]) [Y] 4-7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP2138349  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * the whole document *
by applicantDE102013216584