Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464417

EP3464417 - POLYMERS, PROCESSES, COMPOSITIONS&USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KONING, Cornelis Eme
PO Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
02 / VELDHUIS, Theo
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
03 / MOLHOEK, Leendert Jan
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
04 / BUIJSEN, Paulus Franciscus Anna
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
05 / DRIJFHOUT, Jan Pieter
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)DSM Intellectual Property
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17726919.826.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62797
Priority number, dateWO2016EP17174727.05.2016         Original published format: PCT/EP2016/171747
WO2017EP15445102.02.2017         Original published format: PCT/EP2017/154451
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203045
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464417
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08G63/16, C08G63/42
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:POLYMERE, VERFAHREN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN[2019/15]
English:POLYMERS, PROCESSES, COMPOSITIONS&USES[2019/15]
French:POLYMÈRES, PROCÉDÉS, COMPOSITIONS ET UTILISATIONS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2018National basic fee paid 
05.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
05.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2016012254  (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [A]US4681975  (HASEGAWA RYUICHI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [I]EP1788049  (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-17 * examples 3,7,15,19 *