Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465681

EP3465681 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VOICE OR SOUND ACTIVITY DETECTION FOR SPATIAL AUDIO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / NORVELL, Erik
Hornsbergs strand 37
112 16 STOCKHOLM / SE
02 / BRUHN, Stefan
Vassvägen 11 B
192 67 SOLLENTUNA / SE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17727126.918.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP61953
Priority number, dateUS201662341785P26.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662341785 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202680
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465681
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G10L25/78, H04R1/32
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON SPRACH- ODER GERÄUSCHAKTIVITÄTEN FÜR RÄUMLICHES AUDIO[2019/15]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VOICE OR SOUND ACTIVITY DETECTION FOR SPATIAL AUDIO[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION D'ACTIVITÉ VOCALE OU SONORE POUR LE SON SPATIAL[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2018National basic fee paid 
14.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
14.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2012061145  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8-12,19,20,23,24,27-31,38,39,42-48 * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073] * * figure 1 * [I] 2,3,6,7,13-18,21,22,25,26,32-37,40,41;
 [A]US2014153742  (HERSHEY JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * paragraph [0047] *;
 [A]  - PFAU T ET AL, "Multispeaker speech activity detection for the ICSI meeting recorder", AUTOMATIC SPEECH RECOGNITION AND UNDERSTANDING, 2001. ASRU '01. IEEE W ORKSHOP ON 9-13 DEC. 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20011209), ISBN 978-0-7803-7343-3, pages 107 - 110, XP010603688 [A] 1-48 * figure 1 * * section 2; page 107 - page 108 * * section 3; page 108 *