Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465150

EP3465150 - A CHEMICAL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AMS Sensors UK Limited
Deanland House Cowley Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0DL / GB
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HOPPER, Richard Henry
38A The Westering
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB5 8SF / GB
02 / DE LUCA, Andrea
147 Chesterton Road
Flat C
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 1AA / GB
03 / LEDINS, Kaspars
33 The Westering
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB5 8SE / GB
04 / ALI, Syed Zeeshan
19 Gainsborough Close
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 1SY / GB
05 / CHOWDHURY, Mohamed Foysol
10 Lander Close
Milton Cambridgeshire CB24 6EB / GB
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Iqbal, Md Mash-Hud
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17727317.425.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017GB51467
Priority number, dateUS20161516856231.05.2016         Original published format: US201615168562
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207963
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465150
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/3504, G01N33/00, G01N21/03, G01J5/08
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:CHEMISCHER SENSOR[2019/15]
English:A CHEMICAL SENSOR[2019/15]
French:CAPTEUR CHIMIQUE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
18.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP2743677  (NXP BV [NL]) [X] 1,3,12,15,18,20,26,27 * figures 1-2 * [Y] 2,4,6-11,13,14,16,17,19,21-25,28-30;
 [Y]WO2013167874  (CAMBRIDGE CMOS SENSORS LTD [GB]) [Y] 2,7-9,13,19,21-25,28-30 * figures 1-8, 22-25 *;
 [Y]US2014291704  (ALI SYED ZEESHAN [GB], et al) [Y] 2,4,9,22-25 * figures 1-6, 15-20, 24-27 *;
 [Y]US5834777  (WONG JACOB Y [US]) [Y] 4,6-11 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2005161605  (YOKURA HISANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-30 * figure 2B *;
 [A]KR20090004274  (KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY [KR], et al) [A] 1-30 * [0036];; figure 2 *
 [Y]  - ANDREAS PUSCH ET AL, "A highly efficient CMOS nanoplasmonic crystal enhanced slow-wave thermal emitter improves infrared gas-sensing devices", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20151207), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/srep17451, page 17451, XP055330425 [Y] 14,16,17 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep17451
 [A]  - UDREA F ET AL, "SOI sensing technologies for harsh environment", SEMICONDUCTOR CONFERENCE (CAS), 2012 INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, (20121015), doi:10.1109/SMICND.2012.6400708, ISBN 978-1-4673-0737-6, pages 3 - 10, XP032296403 [A] 1-30 * figures 5,9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SMICND.2012.6400708