Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464820

EP3464820 - METHOD TO MANIPULATE A WELL USING AN UNDERBALANCED PRESSURE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metrol Technology Limited
Unit 24, Kirkhill Place
Kirkhill Industrial Estate
Dyce
Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire AB21 0GU / GB
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ROSS, Shaun Compton
West Cults House
493 North Deeside Road
Aberdeen Aberdeenshire AB15 9ES / GB
02 / JARVIS, Leslie David
Liathach
Woodcot Lane
Stonehaven Aberdeenshire AB39 2GJ / GB
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17727347.126.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017GB51515
Priority number, dateGB2016000928326.05.2016         Original published format: GB 201609283
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203285
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464820
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:E21B49/08, E21B49/00, E21B37/08, E21B21/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Validation statesMA17.12.2018
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM MANIPULIEREN EINES BOHRLOCHS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES UNTERBALANCIERTEN DRUCKBEHÄLTERS[2019/15]
English:METHOD TO MANIPULATE A WELL USING AN UNDERBALANCED PRESSURE CONTAINER[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE MANIPULATION DE PUITS À L'AIDE D'UN RÉCIPIENT SOUS PRESSION SOUS-ÉQUILIBRÉE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2018National basic fee paid 
17.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
17.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2002066563  (LANGSETH BJORN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9-11,13-15,17,19-21,26,30,32,33,35,36,38,39,43,44,46-50 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 9] , [0 35] , [0 39] , [0 50] - [0052] - [0 54] , [0058] , [0 62] , [0066] , [0 67] , [0 71] * * paragraphs [0076] - [0082] - [0093] , [ 104]; figures 1, 2, 6, 8, 15 * [I] 3,5,8,12,16,18,22,25,27-29,31,34,37,40-42,45,51-55;
 [I]US2002020535  (JOHNSON ASHLEY B [US], et al) [I] 1,3,4,6-16,21,23,24,26-30,32,34-40,43-54 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 57] - [0072] - [0 85] - [0090]; figures 4-9 *;
 [I]US2007162235  (ZHAN LANG [US], et al) [I] 1-29,34-40,43-55 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 41] - [0047] - [0 52] - [0057] - [ 116] , [0238] - [0240]; figures 1-3 *;
 [I]US2005077086  (VISE CHARLES E [US]) [I] 1-6,10-14,16-22,27-29,34-40,43-55 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 23] - [0029] - [ 31] - [0035]; figures 1-4 *