Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466181

EP3466181 - RACH COMBINING ACROSS MULTIPLE ATTEMPTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ISLAM, Muhammad Nazmul
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / LI, Junyi
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / SUBRAMANIAN, Sundar
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / CEZANNE, Juergen
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / ABEDINI, Navid
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
06 / LUO, Tao
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17727438.815.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US32732
Priority number, dateUS201662343415P31.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662343415 P
US20161536006223.11.2016         Original published format: US201615360062
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209936
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466181
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W74/08, H04W52/00, H04W72/04, H04B7/02, H04W76/02
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:RACH-KOMBINATION ÜBER MEHRERE VERSUCHE[2019/15]
English:RACH COMBINING ACROSS MULTIPLE ATTEMPTS[2019/15]
French:RACH SE COMBINANT À TRAVERS DE MULTIPLES TENTATIVES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2018National basic fee paid 
13.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
13.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[IA]US2015359005  (WONG SHIN HORNG [GB], et al) [I] 1,8-11,18-21,28-30 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0008] , [0011] , [0012] , [0023] , [0024] , [0083] , [0087] , [0093] * [A] 2-7,12-17,22-27;
 [IA]US2015341963  (FUTAKI HISASHI [JP], et al) [I] 1,8-11,18-21,28-30 * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0148]; figures 14,15 * [A] 2-7,12-17,22-27;
 [IA]US2014233516  (CHUN SUNGDUCK [KR], et al) [I] 1,8-11,18-21,28-30 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0041] , [0064] , [0065]; table 2 * [A] 2-7,12-17,22-27;
 [A]US2014376466  (JEONG CHEOL [KR], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraphs [0035] - [0040]; figures 2,3,6 *;
 [A]US2016119038  (THOMAS TIMOTHY [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - FUJITSU, "The impacts on RAR caused by preamble repetition", vol. RAN WG1, no. Belgrade, Serbia; 20150420 - 20150424, (20150419), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-151565-THE IMPACTS ON RAR CAUSED BY PREAMBLE REPETITION-FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS C, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20150419), XP050934437 [A] 1-30 * Section 2 *
 [XP]  - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "4-step RACH procedure consideration", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170116 - 20170120, (20170110), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1700791 4-STEP RACH PROCEDURE CONSIDERATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1701/Docs/, (20170110), XP051203106 [XP] 1,11,21,30 * Section 4.2; page 8 *