Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465428

EP3465428 - SAMPLE DRIVEN PROFILE GUIDED OPTIMIZATION WITH PRECISE CORRELATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HE, Wenlei
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / TZEN, Ten
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / CHANDAR, Pratap Joseph
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17727442.017.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US32990
Priority number, dateUS20161516368425.05.2016         Original published format: US201615163684
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205118
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465428
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/45, G06F11/34
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:OPTIMIERUNG EINES PROBENGESTEUERTEN PROFILS MIT PRÄZISER KORRELATION[2019/15]
English:SAMPLE DRIVEN PROFILE GUIDED OPTIMIZATION WITH PRECISE CORRELATION[2019/15]
French:OPTIMISATION GUIDÉE PAR PROFIL, PILOTÉE PAR ÉCHANTILLON, AVEC CORRÉLATION PRÉCISE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2018National basic fee paid 
21.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
21.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US6275981  (BUZBEE WILLIAM B [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 61; tables 1,2 * * column 9, line 37 - column 19, line 31 *;
 [A]US2009094590  (MENDELSON BILHA [IL], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1, paragraph 9 - page 1, paragraph 10 * * page 3, paragraph 31 - page 5, paragraph 75 *
 [I]  - XIAOLAN ZHANG ET AL, "System support for automatic profiling and optimization", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19971001), vol. 31, no. 5, doi:10.1145/269005.266640, ISSN 0163-5980, pages 15 - 26, XP058133019 [I] 1-10 * abstract * * page 15, column l, paragraph 1 - page 15, column r, paragraph l * * page 17, column l, paragraph 6 - page 20, column r, paragraph 4; figures 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/269005.266640