Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465430

EP3465430 - VIRTUAL BROWSER INTEGRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Citrix Systems, Inc.
851 West Cypress Creek Road
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MOMCHILOV, Georgy
c/o Citrix Systems Inc.
851 West Cypress Creek Road
Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33309 / US
02 / INGALE, Mukund
c/o Citrix Systems Inc.
851 West Cypress Creek Road
Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33309 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date17727457.822.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US33739
Priority number, dateUS201662340028P23.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662340028 P
US20171547279829.03.2017         Original published format: US201715472798
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205239
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465430
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/455
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:INTEGRATION EINES VIRTUELLEN BROWSERS[2019/15]
English:VIRTUAL BROWSER INTEGRATION[2019/15]
French:INTÉGRATION DE NAVIGATEUR VIRTUEL[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2018National basic fee paid 
28.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
28.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2015339216  (WADE CHRISTOPHER [US]) [I] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0157] * * figures 1-9; claims 1-4,10-17 *;
 [I]US2015026682  (SINGH MANBINDER PAL [IN], et al) [I] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0160] * * figures 1-9; claims 21-30 *