Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472859

EP3472859 - SUBSTRATE SUPPORT ELEMENT FOR A SUPPORT RACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.01.2020
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heraeus Noblelight GmbH
Heraeusstrasse 12-14
63450 Hanau / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PIELA, Thomas
Am Eichgraben 2
63825 Blankenbach / DE
02 / VON RIEWEL, Larissa
Langemarckweg 25
51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [2019/20]
Former [2019/17]01 / PIELA, Thomas
Graf-Philipp-Ludwig-Str. 8
63450 Hanau / DE
02 / VON RIEWEL, Larissa
Jaggerstr. 143a
51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Representative(s)Staudt, Armin Walter
Sandeldamm 24a
63450 Hanau / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17727519.522.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP62289
Priority number, dateDE20161011123620.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016111236
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220272
Date:28.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472859
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/673, H01L21/67, H01L21/687
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SUBSTRAT-TRÄGERELEMENT FÜR EINE TRÄGERHORDE[2019/17]
English:SUBSTRATE SUPPORT ELEMENT FOR A SUPPORT RACK[2019/17]
French:ÉLÉMENT DE SUPPORT DE SUBSTRAT POUR UN PLATEAU SUPPORT[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.08.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/08]
16.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2020/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19712556  (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,10-13 * abstract * * column 7, line 25 - column 9, line 37 * * claims 1, 10 *;
 [A]US2008035632  (FUJITA ICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2015030167  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [P]US2016281227  (KOBAYASHI FUMIYA [JP], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0061] , [0 94] , [ 127] * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US6799940  (JOE RAYMOND [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * claims 1, 6-9 *;
 [A]US2007184397  (ADACHI NAOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0061] , [0 64] , [0 89] *;
 [A]JP2010129764  (NUFLARE TECHNOLOGY INC) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]US2003209719  (NAKAMURA SHUJI [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * claims 1, 3, 4, 16 *;
 [A]US5679168  (PORTER COLE D [US], et al) [A] 12-14 * abstract * * column 3, lines 6-17 * * column 5, lines 38-50 *
by applicantDE202005001721U