Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463546

EP3463546 - AFTER-INSECT BITE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asches S.r.l.
Via Marconi, 14
24050 Grassobbio / IT
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BALZARINI, Roberto
Via Zanchi 3a
I-24040 Stezzano (BG) / IT
02 / COSSOLINI, Giacomo
Via del Vagine, 10
I-24129 Bergamo (BG) / IT
03 / BALZARINI, Fabio
Via Campagnola, 32
I-24126 Bergamo (BG) / IT
04 / CARPINO, Silvia
Via Camozzi, 130
I-24121 Bergamo (BG) / IT
05 / TROTTA, Umberto
Via Naploeone Bassani 12
I-24036 Ponte San Pietro (BG) / IT
 [2019/27]
Former [2019/25]01 / BALZARINI, Roberto
Via Zanchi 3a
I-24040 Stezzano (BG) / IT
02 / COSSOLINI, Giacomo
Via del Vagine, 10
I-24129 Bergamo (BG) / IT
03 / BALZARINI, Fabio
Via Campagnola, 32
I-24126 Bergamo (BG) / IT
04 / CARPINO, Silvia
Via Camozzi, 130
I-24121 Bergamo BG) / IT
05 / TROTTA, Umberto
Via Naploeone Bassani 12
I-24036 Ponte San Pietro (BG) / IT
Former [2019/20]01 / BALZARINI, Roberto
Via Zanchi 3a
I-24040 Stezzano (BG) / IT
02 / COSSOLINI, Giacomo
Via del Vagine, 10
I-24129 Bergamo (BG) / IT
03 / BALZARINI, Fabio
Via Campagnola, 32
I-24126 Bergamo (BG) / IT
04 / CARPINO, Silvia
Via Camozzi, 130
I-24121 BG) / IT
05 / TROTTA, Umberto
Via Naploeone Bassani 12
I-24036 Ponte San Pietro (BG) / IT
Former [2019/15]01 / BALZARINI, Roberto
Via Zanchi 3a
I-24040 Stezzano (BG) / IT
02 / COSSOLINI, Giacomo
Via Zanchi 3a
I-24040 Stezzano (BG) / IT
03 / BALZARINI, Fabio
Via Zanchi 3a
I-24040 Stezzano (BG) / IT
04 / CARPINO, Silvia
Via Zanchi 3a
I-24040 Stezzano (BG) / IT
05 / TROTTA, Umberto
Via Zanchi 3a
I-24040 Stezzano (BG) / IT
Representative(s)Boggio Merlo, Anita , et al
Dragotti & Associati S.r.l.
Via Nino Bixio, 7
20129 Milano / IT
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17727537.724.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62573
Priority number, dateIT2016UA0430424.05.2016         Original published format: IT UA20164304
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017202931
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463546
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61M35/00, A61F7/00, A61B17/00, A61B18/00, A61F7/02
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANWENDUNG NACH INSEKTENBISSEN[2019/15]
English:AFTER-INSECT BITE DEVICE[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF APRÈS MORSURE D'INSECTE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase15.11.2018National basic fee paid 
15.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
15.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2004127962  (LI HUAN-CHEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,2,4 * * paragraphs [0020] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0062] *;
 [Y]US2014276359  (ALVAREZ ALEXANDRA [US]) [Y] 6-8 * paragraphs [0044] , [0048] - [0049] * * paragraphs [0068] , [0079] , [0092] , [0100] *;
 [Y]US2007100403  (FELICE DONALD F [US], et al) [Y] 4 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2895236  (GUILLERME STEPHANE DANIEL MARI [FR]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-3 * * page 3, line 2 * * page 4, lines 19-20 *;
 [A]US2009118684  (DA SILVA LUIZ B [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0038] *;
 [Y]ES2134163  (SERNA ROMERA ADOLFO [ES]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO0016752  (LAVIPHARM LAB INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]CN102836351B  (WANNAN MEDICAL COLLEGE) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *