Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465912

EP3465912 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING A SWITCHING VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Technology GmbH
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / CHIVITE ZABALZA, Francisco Javier
19 Brent Close
Stafford Staffordshire ST17 4XQ / GB
02 / BRIFF, Pablo
29 Virginia Avenue
Stafford Staffordshire ST17 4YA / GB
03 / NICHOLLS, Jonathan Christopher
5 Northgate
North Street
Derby Derbyshire DE1 3AJ / GB
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Fischer, Michael Maria
General Electric Technology GmbH
Global Patent Operation - Europe
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date17727557.526.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62786
Priority number, dateGB2016000938427.05.2016         Original published format: GB 201609384
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203039
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465912
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H03K17/10, H03K17/082, H03K17/28
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES SCHALTVENTILS[2019/15]
English:METHOD OF CONTROLLING A SWITCHING VALVE[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE VALVE DE COMMUTATION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]CA2185559  (SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [X] 1-8,14-24 * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 2; figure 1 * * claim 1 * * page 12, line 7 - line 11 * * page 9, lines 27-31 *;
 [XI]US2010148847  (SCHURACK JOHANNES [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-8,14,17-24 * paragraph [0045]; figure 1 * [I] 15,16;
 [XI]US5566063  (GERSTER CHRISTIAN PROF [CH] ET AL) [X] 1,4-8,14,15,19-24 * column 3, line 51 - line 53; figures 1b,2,9; claim 1 * * column 4, line 12 - line 15 * [I] 2,3,16-18