Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468496

EP3468496 - ELECTROSURGICAL DEVICE WITH INTEGRATED MICROWAVE SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Creo Medical Limited
Riverside Court
Beaufort Park
Chepstow, Monmounthshire NP16 5UH / GB
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HANCOCK, Christopher Paul
37 Napier Road
Bath Bath and North East Somerset BA1 4LN / GB
02 / BURN, Patrick
c/o Creo Medical Limited
Riverside Court
Beaufort Park
Chepstow Monmouthshire NP16 5UH / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17727598.905.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP63609
Priority number, dateGB2016001025213.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610252
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215972
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468496
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/18
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT INTEGRIERTER MIKROWELLENQUELLE[2019/16]
English:ELECTROSURGICAL DEVICE WITH INTEGRATED MICROWAVE SOURCE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRO-CHIRURGICAL À SOURCE DE MICRO-ONDES INTÉGRÉE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2018National basic fee paid 
02.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
02.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2010036369  (HANCOCK CHRISTOPHER PAUL [GB]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * paragraphs [0018] , [0027] , [0038] , [0056] , [0062] , [0064] , [0070] , [0110] , [0131] , [0170]; figures 1b, 1c, 2a-c, 4-6 * [A] 12-15 [I] 4,9-11;
 [XA]US2013072920  (BEHNKE II ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-8,14 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] - [0047] , [0057] , [0069] , [0078] , [0085] , [0086] , [0093]; figures 3,4 * [A] 9-13,15;
 [XAI]US2010145328  (HANCOCK CHRISTOPHER PAUL [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12,14 * paragraphs [0010] , [0016] , [0017] , [0023] , [0041] , [0054] - [0055] - [0082] , [0105] , [0114] , [0115] , [0122]; figures 4,5,10,11; claim 40 * [A] 13,15 [I] 9;
 [XAI]US2012035688  (HANCOCK CHRISTOPHER P [GB]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,11,14 * paragraphs [0071] , [0120] , [0122] , [0126] , [0128] , [0140]; figure 10 * [A] 12,13,15 [I] 4,9;
 [XAI]US2010286681  (PODHAJSKY RONALD J [US]) [X] 1-3,14,15 * paragraphs [0070] , [0075] , [0084] - [0095]; figures 5A,6 * [A] 7-13 [I] 4-6