Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3468496 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3468496



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 148
20.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.01.2019 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.2018 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
21.12.2018 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
20.12.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.12.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
13.12.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
19.11.2018 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
02.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.11.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.11.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
25.05.2018 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
25.05.2018 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.05.2018 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.05.2018 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
25.05.2018 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.05.2018 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
20.04.2018 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.04.2018 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
13.04.2018 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
13.04.2018 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.04.2018 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 23
05.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
05.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
05.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
11.07.2017 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) PCT receiving Office 1
09.06.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 1
05.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
05.06.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
05.06.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
05.06.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 16
05.06.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 4
05.06.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 5
05.06.2017 Payment of fees and costs PCT receiving Office 2