Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469649

EP3469649 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING THIN FILMS OF SOLID ELECTROLYTES COMPRISING LITHIUM AND SULFUR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BAECKER, Michael
Heisenbergstrasse 16
53359 Rheinbach / DE
02 / WALDMANN, Daniel
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
03 / KULISCH, Joern
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
04 / TER MAAT, Johan
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
05 / HARTMANN, Pascal
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
06 / MOSIADZ, Mariusz
Heisenbergstraße 16
53359 Rheinbach / DE
07 / BAUMANN, Annika
Heisenbergstrasse 16
53359 Rheinbach / DE
08 / EWALD, Lukas
Heisenbergstraße 16
53359 Rheinbach / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)BASF IP Association
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17727611.007.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP63828
Priority number, dateEP2016017419613.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16174196
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216006
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469649
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/0562
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DÜNNSCHICHTEN AUS FESTELEKTROLYTEN MIT LITHIUM UND SCHWEFEL[2019/16]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING THIN FILMS OF SOLID ELECTROLYTES COMPRISING LITHIUM AND SULFUR[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE FILMS MINCES D'ÉLECTROLYTES SOLIDES COMPRENANT DU LITHIUM ET DU SOUFRE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.07.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[ID]JP2014191899  (UNIV OSAKA PREFECTURE) [ID] 1-10 * paragraphs [0023] - [0024] *;
 [I]US2011049745  (KATAYAMA YUKIHISA [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * figure 1 * * claim 6 * * paragraph [0043] *;
 [A]EP1217682  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-10 * claim 2 * * example - * * paragraph [0022] *;
 [A]US2014120427  (SUYAMA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0088] - [0090] * * paragraph [0046] *
by applicantJP2014191899
 WO2015050131
    - J. AM. CERAM. SOC., (2010), vol. 93, no. 3, pages 765 - 768
    - CHEM. LETT., (2013), vol. 42, pages 1435 - 1437
    - J. POWER SOURCES, (2014), vol. 248, pages 939 - 942
    - MIZUNO ET AL., ADV. MATER., (2005), vol. 17, pages 918 - 921