Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469090

EP3469090 - SEED TRAIN FOR LARGE SCALE ENZYME PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DE CASTRO BIZARRO DUARTE CANELAS, André
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA ECHT / NL
02 / VAN WINDEN, Wouter Adrianus
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA ECHT / NL
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)DSM Intellectual Property
P.O. Box 4
6100 AA Echt / NL
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17727626.808.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP63975
Priority number, dateEP2016017365409.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16173654
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211957
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469090
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12P21/00, C12N1/14, C12N9/42
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ANZUCHTSCHIENE ZUR GROSSSKALIGEN ENZYMPRODUKTION[2019/16]
English:SEED TRAIN FOR LARGE SCALE ENZYME PRODUCTION[2019/16]
French:TRAIN DE GRAINES POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ENZYMES À GRANDE ÉCHELLE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2018National basic fee paid 
13.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
13.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]  - D Humbird ET AL, "Process Design and Economics for Biochemical Conversion of Lignocellulosic Biomass to Ethanol / Dilute-Acid Pretreatment and Enzymatic Hydrolysis of Corn Stover", Technical Report NREL/TP-5100-47764, USA, (20110501), pages i-ix, 1 - 136, a, URL: http://www.nrel.gov/docs/fy11osti/47764.pdf, (20130807), XP055074410 [X] 11,12 * pages 36-39 * [A] 1-10
 [XI]  - ZSOLT BARTA ET AL, "Process Design and Economics of On-Site Cellulase Production on Various Carbon Sources in a Softwood-Based Ethanol Plant", ENZYME RESEARCH, (20100101), vol. 84, no. 8, doi:10.1016/0960-8524(91)90099-6, pages 62 - 8, XP055326858 [X] 11,12 * page 3, paragraph 2.4 * * abstract * [I] 1-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4061/2010/734182
 [A]  - DEMETRI PETRIDES ET AL, "Biopharmaceutical Process Optimization with Simulation and Scheduling Tools", BIOENGINEERING, (20140929), vol. 1, no. 4, doi:10.3390/bioengineering1040154, pages 154 - 187, XP055253446 [A] 1-12 * page 162, paragraphs 2.4.-2.6. - page 169; figures 3-6; table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/bioengineering1040154
 [A]  - Abdelaziz Toumi ET AL, "Design and Optimization of a Large Scale Biopharmaceutical Facility Using Process Simulation and Scheduling Tools", (20100308), pages 1 - 9, URL: https://www.ispe.gr.jp/ISPE/07_public/pdf/201203_en.pdf, (20160225), XP055253228 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantWO02095014
 WO2008057637
 WO2005047499
 WO2014130812
 WO2012044915
 WO2007019442
 US6022725
 US6982159
 US7045332
 US7005289
 US2006258554
 US2004102619
 WO2011035029
 WO9105039
 WO9315186
 US5275944
 WO9602551
 US5536655
 WO0070031
 WO2005093050
 WO2011057140
 WO2005074656
 WO2010065830
 WO2005074647
 WO2008148131
 WO2011035027
 WO2010138754
 WO2011041397
 WO2007089290
 WO2009085935
 WO2009085859
 WO2009085864
 WO2009085868
 WO2011005867
 WO2011039319
 WO2011041504
 WO2008151043
 WO9813465
 WO9815619
 WO9815633
 WO9906574
 WO9910481
 WO9925847
 WO9931255
 WO02101078
 WO03027306
 WO03052054
 WO03052055
 WO03052056
 WO03052057
 WO03052118
 WO2004016760
 WO2004043980
 WO2004048592
 WO2005001065
 WO2005028636
 WO2005093073
 WO2006074005
 WO2006117432
 WO2007071818
 WO2007071820
 WO2008008070
 WO2008008793
 US5457046
 US5648263
 US5686593
 WO9421785
 WO2006078256
 WO2011041405
 WO2010126772
 WO2009079210
 WO2011057083
 WO2010108918
 WO2009073709
 WO2005001036
 WO2010014880
 WO2009042846
 WO2009076122
 WO2009127729
 WO2010053838
 WO2010065448
 WO2006114094
 WO2009073383
 WO2010014706
 WO2009068565
 WO03095627
 WO2008041840
 EP1499708
 WO2009011591
 EP1468093
 WO2006009434
    - ISAKSEN ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 289, no. 5, pages 2632 - 2642
    - FOREMAN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, no. 34, pages 31988 - 31997