Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463125

EP3463125 - ERGONOMIC TUBING ATTACHMENT FOR MEDICAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Integra Lifesciences NR Ireland Limited
Sixth Floor
2 Grand Canal Square
Dublin 2 / IE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MANANDHAR, Prakash
97 Bodwell Street
Lawrence, Massachusetts 01841 / US
02 / COTTER, Daniel J.
16 Partridge Way
North Easton, Massachusetts 02356 / US
03 / KETELHOHN, Robert A.
15 Brittany Lane
Dunstable, Massachusetts 01827 / US
04 / GOULD, Peter L.
19 Pennichuck Street
Nashua, New Hampshire 03064 / US
05 / METIVIER, Todd
8 Blueberry Lane
Nashua, New Hampshire 03062 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17727714.219.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017IB52980
Priority number, dateUS201662340591P24.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662340591 P
US201662424589P21.11.2016         Original published format: US 201662424589 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203408
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463125
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/34, A61B1/00, A61B1/005, A61B17/22, E05B73/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ERGONOMISCHE SCHLAUCHBEFESTIGUNG FÜR MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:ERGONOMIC TUBING ATTACHMENT FOR MEDICAL APPARATUS[2019/15]
French:ACCESSOIRE DE TUBE ERGONOMIQUE POUR APPAREIL MÉDICAL[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase15.10.2018National basic fee paid 
15.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
15.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2006063973  (MAKOWER JOSHUA [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0130] - [0134] - [0165]; figures 6J-Q *;
 [Y]WO2014134292  (NORMAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * figures 14,15 *;
 [A]WO2015061258  (B & G PLASTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * figures 16-20 *
by applicantUS5015227
 US4988334
 US8211103
 US2008200884
    - SURGICAL ENDOSCOPY, (1999), vol. 13, pages 466 - 468
    - J. OF CLINICAL OUTCOMES MANAGEMENT, (2015), vol. 22, no. 6, pages 267 - 273