Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472031

EP3472031 - VEHICLE ACTIVE SIDE VENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SRG Global, Inc.
800 Stephenson Highway
Troy, Michigan 48083 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / FRAYER, Rob
800 Stephenson Hwy
Troy Michigan 48083 / US
02 / AYOUB, Patrick
800 Stephenson Hwy
Troy Michigan 48083 / US
03 / DUNFORD, David Michael
800 Stephenson Hwy
Troy Michigan 48083 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP
Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor
Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17727756.310.05.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US31902
Priority number, dateUS20161518533217.06.2016         Original published format: US201615185332
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218105
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472031
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B62D35/00, B60K11/08
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:AKTIVES SEITENENTLÜFTUNGSSYSTEM EINES FAHRZEUGS[2019/17]
English:VEHICLE ACTIVE SIDE VENT SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME D'AÉRATION LATÉRAL ACTIF DE VÉHICULE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2019National basic fee paid 
04.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
04.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2897833  (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 19 - page 6, line 9; figure - *;
 [A]DE10213188  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0016]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2016016617  (WOLF THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]DE3834119  (KIRSCHNER PETER [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 14; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE102008019923  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0021] - [0024]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JP2013060845  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-5 *