Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466174

EP3466174 - METHOD AND APPARATUSES FOR PREEMPTING TRAFFIC IN A LICENSED FREQUENCY BAND FOR MISSION CRITICAL COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Chong
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / LI, Junyi
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17727771.215.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US32710
Priority number, dateUS20161517089601.06.2016         Original published format: US201615170896
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209933
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466174
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/12, H04W36/14
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VORWEGNAHME VON VERKEHR IN EINEM LIZENZIERTEN FREQUENZBAND FÜR MISSIONSKRITISCHE KOMMUNIKATION[2019/15]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUSES FOR PREEMPTING TRAFFIC IN A LICENSED FREQUENCY BAND FOR MISSION CRITICAL COMMUNICATIONS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREILS DESTINÉS À PRÉVENIR UN TRAFIC DANS UNE BANDE DE FRÉQUENCE AUTORISÉE PAR LICENCE POUR DES COMMUNICATIONS DE CRITIQUE DE MISSION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2018National basic fee paid 
25.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
25.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]EP2706784  (ACER INC [TW]) [Y] 1-13,19-27 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019]; figure 3 * [A] 14-18,28-30;
 [XYI]WO2013100771  (MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS INC [US]; JURZAK PAWEL [PL]; BELLIZIO JIM [US]; DWO) [X] 14,28 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] * [Y] 1-13,19-27 [I] 15-18,29,30;
 [E]WO2017091478  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [E] 1,14,20,28 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0079]; figure 4 *