Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464619

EP3464619 - NOVEL BIOMARKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CureVac AG
Paul-Ehrlich-Str. 15
72076 Tübingen / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KOCH, Sven
Flemingstrasse 80
81925 München / DE
02 / HONG, Henoch
Bergheimer Strasse 70
Heidelberg 69115 / DE
03 / FOTIN-MLECZEK, Mariola
Chemnitzer Weg 10
71065 Sindelfingen / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17727847.024.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP62694
Priority number, dateWO2016EP6182925.05.2016         Original published format: PCT/EP2016/061829
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203008
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464619
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:NEUARTIGE BIOMARKER[2019/15]
English:NOVEL BIOMARKERS[2019/15]
French:NOUVEAUX BIOMARQUEURS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.11.2018National basic fee paid 
07.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
07.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2013095793  (AVEO PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * example 6 *;
 [X]  - Thodima, "Molecular classification of sunitinib response in metastatic renal cell carcinoma (mRCC) patients by gene expression profiling.", J Clin Oncol 29: 2011 (suppl; abstr 4556), (2011), URL: http://meetinglibrary.asco.org/content/80686-102, XP002766469 [X] 17-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/jco.2011.29.15_suppl.4556
 [X]  - ZHU ET AL, "Long noncoding RNA expression signatures of bladder cancer revealed by microarray", ONCOLOGY LETTERS, GR, (20140131), vol. 7, doi:10.3892/ol.2014.1843, ISSN 1792-1074, pages 1197 - 1202, XP055339971 [X] 17-21 * table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/ol.2014.1843
 [A]  - VEER VAN 'T L J ET AL, "Gene expression profiling predicts clinical outcome of breast cancer", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, UNITED KINGDOM, (20020131), vol. 415, no. 6871, doi:10.1038/415530A, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 530 - 536, XP002259781 [A] 1-21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/415530a
by applicantWO2015024664
 WO2009046974
    - SEBASTIAN ET AL., BMC CANCER, (2014), vol. 14, page 748