Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465206

EP3465206 - METHOD FOR THE DETECTION OF AN IGM ANTIBODY SPECIFIC FOR A FLAVIVIUS IN A SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/15]Method for the detection of an IgM antibody specific for a flavivirus in a sample
[2019/31]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.07.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medizinische Universität Wien
Spitalgasse 23
1090 Wien / AT
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HEINZ, Franz X.
Rosenackerstraße 43
1170 Vienna / AT
02 / STIASNY, Karin
Severingasse 4/14
1090 Vienna / AT
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17727873.602.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP63446
Priority number, dateEP2016017304306.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16173043
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211713
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465206
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/543, G01N33/569, G01N33/58
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION EINES FÜR EINEN FLAVIVIRUS IN EINER PROBE SPEZIFISCHEN IGM-ANTIKÖRPERS[2019/31]
English:METHOD FOR THE DETECTION OF AN IGM ANTIBODY SPECIFIC FOR A FLAVIVIUS IN A SAMPLE[2019/31]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTECTION D'UN ANTICORPS IGM SPÉCIFIQUE D'UN FLAVIVIRUS DANS UN ÉCHANTILLON[2019/31]
Former [2019/15]VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION EINES FÜR EIN FLAVIVIRUS SPEZIFISCHEN IGM-ANTIKÖRPERS IN EINER PROBE
Former [2019/15]Method for the detection of an IgM antibody specific for a flavivirus in a sample
Former [2019/15]PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UN ANTICORPS IGM SPÉCIFIQUE D'UN FLAVIVIRUS DANS UN ÉCHANTILLON
Entry into regional phase03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
03.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]WO9906068  (HAWAII BIOTECH GROUP [US]) [Y] 1,3-16 * page 15, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 3; example 8 * [A] 2;
 [A]WO2004052293  (HAWAII BIOTECH INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0093] *;
 [A]WO2006115548  (HAWAII BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0100] *;
 [A]WO2016012800  (IMP INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-16 * claims 1-155 *
 [YA]  - A M VAN LOON ET AL, "Enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay that uses labeled antigen for detection of immunoglobulin M and A antibodies in toxoplasmosis: comparison with indirect immunofluorescence and double-sandwich enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19830601), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 997 - 1004, XP055318823 [Y] 1,3-16 * page 1001, column r, paragraph 2 - page 1003, column l, paragraph 2 * [A] 2
 [Y]  - A M VAN LOON ET AL, "Direct enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay that uses peroxidase-labeled antigen for determination of immunoglobulin M antibody to cytomegalovirus", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19810301), vol. 13, no. 3, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 416 - 422, XP055318832 [Y] 1,3-16 * page 421, column l, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 *
 [YA]  - OKSANA VRATSKIKH ET AL, "Dissection of Antibody Specificities Induced by Yellow Fever Vaccination", PLOS PATHOGENS, (20130620), vol. 9, no. 6, doi:10.1371/journal.ppat.1003458, page e1003458, XP055318005 [Y] 1,3-16 * the whole document * [A] 2

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.ppat.1003458
 [YA]  - J. JARMER ET AL, "Variation of the Specificity of the Human Antibody Responses after Tick-Borne Encephalitis Virus Infection and Vaccination", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., US, (20140924), vol. 88, no. 23, doi:10.1128/JVI.02086-14, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 13845 - 13857, XP055318006 [Y] 1,3-16 * the whole document * [A] 2

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.02086-14
 [A]  - M. R. VOGT ET AL, "Human Monoclonal Antibodies against West Nile Virus Induced by Natural Infection Neutralize at a Postattachment Step", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., US, (20090701), vol. 83, no. 13, doi:10.1128/JVI.00286-09, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 6494 - 6507, XP055317814 [A] 1-16 * page 83, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.00286-09
 [A]  - F X HEINZ ET AL, "Comparison of two different enzyme immunoassays for detection of immunoglobulin M antibodies against tick-borne encephalitis virus in serum and cerebrospinal fluid", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19810801), vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 141 - 146, XP055319199 [A] 1-16 * page 142, column l, paragraph 5 - column r, paragraph 1 *