Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472227

EP3472227 - POLYSILOXANE BASED AEROGELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
For all designated states
Henkel IP & Holding GmbH
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BASSAGANAS TURON, Sergi
Carrer Ignasi Rubió 8
17800 Olot Girona / ES
02 / MIGUEL GARCÍA, Izaskun
Avenida Sant Marc 21
03581 Alfaz del Pi Alicante / ES
03 / TORRES CANO, Elisabet
Passeig Sant Gervasio 87 1° 4a
08022 Barcelona / ES
04 / SALHI, Fouad
299 Colt Highway Apt 428
Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US
05 / DEL SAZ-OROZCO, Belén
Calle Helade nº21
28232 Las Rozas de Madrid / ES
 [2019/17]
Application number, filing date17727916.308.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP63969
Priority number, dateEP2016017501017.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16175010
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216034
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472227
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08G77/14, C08G77/16, C08G77/458, C08L83/10, C08L83/14, C08K3/00, C08K7/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:POLYSILOXANBASIERTE AEROGELE[2019/17]
English:POLYSILOXANE BASED AEROGELS[2019/17]
French:AÉROGELS À BASE DE POLYSILOXANE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2018National basic fee paid 
22.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
22.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2016152739  (EILBRACHT CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-11,14,15 * page 1, paragraph 11 * * page 2, paragraphs 22-33 * * page 6, paragraph 69 * * page 7, paragraphs 74-75 * * page 8, paragraphs 86-88 * * example 1 * [Y] 1-11,14,15;
 [X]US2005009985  (SELBERTINGER ERNST [DE], et al) [X] 1-10,14,15 * page 2, paragraphs 41-52 * * page 3, paragraphs 55,65,68 * * example 2 *;
 [X]US2015203635  (TAPSAK MARK ALLAN [US]) [X] 1-10,12,13 * page 5, paragraph 46 * * page 6, paragraph 49 * * page 6, paragraph 61 - page 7, paragraph 61 * * page 9, paragraph 70 - page 10, paragraph 70 * * example 1 *;
 [X]WO9308227  (DAP PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 6 * * page 5, lines 17-27 * * page 6, lines 7-21 * * page 7, lines 17-32 * * page 8, lines 7-30 * * example 1 *;
 [Y]US2014323676  (MEHRABI MANSOUR [AU], et al) [Y] 1-11,14,15 * page 1, paragraphs 8-11 * * page 3, paragraph 50 - page 4, paragraph 53 * * page 7, paragraph 90 * * page 8, paragraphs 102-105 *