Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465574

EP3465574 - AUTOMATICALLY SHARING A DOCUMENT WITH USER ACCESS PERMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / WEAVER, Joan Catharine
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / WILDE, Benjamin Gustav
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / GAN, Patrick Michael
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / KESSLER, Jade
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
05 / O'CONNELL, Erin M.
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
06 / MARASHI, Suzan
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
07 / STENERSON, Derik
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17728017.924.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34097
Priority number, dateUS20161517205802.06.2016         Original published format: US201615172058
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210032
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465574
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/10, G06F17/24, H04L29/06
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE GEMEINSAME NUTZUNG EINES DOKUMENTS MIT BENUTZERZUGRIFFSRECHTEN[2019/15]
English:AUTOMATICALLY SHARING A DOCUMENT WITH USER ACCESS PERMISSIONS[2019/15]
French:PARTAGE AUTOMATIQUE D'UN DOCUMENT AU MOYEN D'AUTORISATIONS D'ACCÈS UTILISATEUR[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2018National basic fee paid 
27.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
27.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2012125338  (GOOGLE INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0141] *;
 [I]US2006224735  (HILL CHARLES R [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2013067303  (KANTOR ARCADIY G [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0058] *