Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464562

EP3464562 - PROCESS FOR GENERATION, IDENTIFICATION AND ISOLATION OF HUMAN PLURIPOTENT STEM CELL-DERIVED CARDIOMYOCYTES AND CARDIOMYOCYTE SUBPOPULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Miltenyi Biotec GmbH
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 68
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / NOACK, Kristin
Moitzfeld 73
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
02 / ECKARDT, Dominik
Diakonissenweg 29
51429 Bergisch Gadbach / DE
03 / BOSIO, Andreas
Hanfweg 17
50939 Köln / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Biervert, Christian
Miltenyi Biotec GmbH
Corporate Legal Department
Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 68
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17728118.530.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP63047
Priority number, dateEP2016017252801.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16172528
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207576
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464562
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/077, C12N5/0735, C12N5/074
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG, IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND ISOLIERUNG VON MENSCHLICHEN PLURIPOTENTEN STAMMZELLEN AUS KARDIOMYOZYTEN UND KARDIOMYOZYT-SUBPOPULATIONEN[2019/15]
English:PROCESS FOR GENERATION, IDENTIFICATION AND ISOLATION OF HUMAN PLURIPOTENT STEM CELL-DERIVED CARDIOMYOCYTES AND CARDIOMYOCYTE SUBPOPULATIONS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, D'IDENTIFICATION ET D'ISOLEMENT DE CARDIOMYOCYTES DÉRIVÉS DE CELLULES SOUCHES PLURIPOTENTES HUMAINES ET SOUS-POPULATIONS DE CARDIOMYOCYTES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2018National basic fee paid 
17.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
17.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XDYI]WO2012135253  (GERON CORP [US]; O'SULLIVAN CHRISTOPHER [US]; NISHIMOTO KEVIN [US]; RE) [XD] 14 * the whole document * * page 58 - page 61; examples VI-VII * * claim 50 * [Y] 2,6-13,15 [I] 1,3-5;
 [XY]WO2012133954  (UNIV KYOTO [JP]; YAMASHITA JUN [JP]; UOSAKI HIDEKI [JP]) [X] 14 * the whole document * * claims 1-12 * [Y] 6-12,15;
 [XY]WO2014014119  (UNIV KYOTO [JP]) [X] 14 * the whole document * * claims 1-15 * [Y] 6-12,15;
 [XY]  - DUBOIS NICOLE C ET AL, "SIRPA is a specific cell-surface marker for isolating cardiomyocytes derived from human pluripotent stem cells", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, GALE GROUP INC, US, vol. 29, no. 11, doi:10.1038/NBT.2005, ISSN 1087-0156, (20111101), pages 1011 - 1019, (20111023), XP009167979 [X] 14 * the whole document * * page 1016, paragraph 2; figure 7 * [Y] 2

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2005
 [XY]  - CHUNHUI XU, "Differentiation and enrichment of cardiomyocytes from human pluripotent stem cells", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR CARDIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, GB, vol. 52, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.YJMCC.2012.03.012, ISSN 0022-2828, (20120320), pages 1203 - 1212, (20120330), XP028482910 [X] 14 * the whole document * [Y] 2,6-13,15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yjmcc.2012.03.012
by applicantUS2014134733
 US2014193909
 WO2013063305
 US2009275132
 US2015184129
 WO2012135253
 WO2012024782
 WO2009072003
 WO03046141
    - BURRIDGE ET AL., "Chemically defined generation of human cardiomyocytes", NAT METHODS, (2014), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth.2999, pages 855 - 60, XP055239845

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.2999
    - DUBOIS ET AL., "SIRPA is a specific cell-surface marker for isolating cardiomyocytes derived from human pluripotent stem cells", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (2011), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1038/NBT.1005, pages 1011 - 8, XP002694003

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT.1005
    - FUERSTENAU-SHARP ET AL., "Generation of highly purified human cardiomyocytes from peripheral blood mononuclear cell-derived induced pluripotent stem cells.", PLOS ONE, (2015), vol. 10, no. 5, page E0126596, XP002763626
    - PICCINI ET AL., "Human pluripotent stem cell-derived cardiomyocytes: Genome-wide expression profiling of long-term in vitro maturation in comparison to human heart tissue", GENOM DATA, (2015), vol. 4, pages 69 - 72
    - SKELTON ET AL., "CD13 and ROR2 Permit Isolation of Highly Enriched Cardiac Mesoderm from Differentiating Human Embryonic Stem Cells", STEM CELL REPORTS., (2016), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 95 - 108
    - TOHYAMA ET AL., "Distinct metabolic flow enables large-scale purification of mouse and human pluripotent stem cell-derived cardiomyocytes", CELL STEM CELL., (2013), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.stem.2012.09.013, pages 127 - 37, XP055175411

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2012.09.013
    - UOSAKI ET AL., "Efficient and scalable purification of cardiomyocytes from human embryonic and induced pluripotent stem cells by VCAM1 surface expression.", PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, no. 8, page E23657
    - VAN DEN BERG ET AL., "Transcriptome of human foetal heart compared with cardiomyocytes from pluripotent stem cells", DEVELOPMENT, (2015), vol. 142, pages 3231 - 8
    - XU ET AL., "Highly enriched cardiomyocytes from human embryonic stem cells", CYTOTHERAPY, (2008), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1080/14653240802105307, pages 376 - 89, XP002707706

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/14653240802105307
    - ZHANG ET AL., "Universal cardiac induction of human pluripotent stem cells in two and three-dimensional formats: implications for in vitro maturation.", STEM CELLS, (2015), vol. 33, pages 1456 - 69
 EP20140167201