blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3465217 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3465217



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 377
09.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.08.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
09.08.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
09.08.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
09.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.06.2019 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
13.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
30.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
17.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.12.2018 Annex Search / examination 3
17.12.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
11.12.2018 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
12.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
07.09.2018 Despatch of copy of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.09.2018 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.09.2018 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
07.09.2018 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
07.09.2018 Result of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.09.2018 Separate sheet with IPEA428 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.09.2018 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.07.2018 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.07.2018 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
09.05.2018 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.05.2018 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
09.05.2018 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.04.2018 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
05.04.2018 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.03.2018 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.03.2018 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
13.03.2018 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.03.2018 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
22.02.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
21.02.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
07.12.2017 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 3
07.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
07.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 48
10.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
10.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
10.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.07.2017 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) PCT receiving Office 1
06.07.2017 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
06.07.2017 RO101 Declaration PCT receiving Office 2
20.06.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 9
31.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
31.05.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
31.05.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
31.05.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 45
31.05.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
31.05.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 8
31.05.2017 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 53