Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465217

EP3465217 - METHOD FOR SEROLOGICAL DETECTION OF VIRAL ANTIGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Straße 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BOLLHAGEN, Ralf
Kapellenwiese 4
82377 Penzberg / DE
02 / UPMEIER, Barbara
Egerländerstrasse 12 C
82393 Iffeldorf / DE
03 / ZARNT, Toralf
Maistrasse 10
82377 Penzberg / DE
04 / MÜNCH, Peter
Ponholzweg 6
82377 Penzberg / DE
05 / GINTER, Manfred
Hauptstrasse 31
82407 Wielenbach / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date17728125.031.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP63096
Priority number, dateEP2016017214431.05.2016         Original published format: EP 16172144
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207599
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465217
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/576
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SEROLOGISCHEN NACHWEIS VON VIRUSANTIGENEN[2019/15]
English:METHOD FOR SEROLOGICAL DETECTION OF VIRAL ANTIGENS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION SÉROLOGIQUE D'ANTIGÈNES VIRAUX[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2018National basic fee paid 
17.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
17.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP2327987  (SYSMEX CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0967484  (ADVANCED LIFE SCIENCE INST INC [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0093] *;
 [I]EP0363110  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [I] 1-14 * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line l; example 1; claim - *;
 [X]WO2012168003  (BIOCARTIS S A [CH], et al) [X] 12,13 * claims 1, 8, 14-16 *;
 [A]  - SANSONNO D ET AL, "Detection and quantitation of HCV core protein in single hepatocytes by means of laser capture microdissection and enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay.", JOURNAL OF VIRAL HEPATITIS JAN 2004, (200401), vol. 11, no. 1, ISSN 1352-0504, pages 27 - 32, XP002763516 [A] 1-14 * page 28, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 *
 [A]  - KASHIWAKUMA T ET AL, "Detection of hepatitis C virus specific core protein in serum of patients by a sensitive fluorescence enzyme immunoassay (FEIA)", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960328), vol. 190, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0022-1759(95)00261-8, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 79 - 89, XP004020891 [A] 1-14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(95)00261-8