Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465789

EP3465789 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLURALITY OF PIEZOELECTRIC MULTILAYER COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TDK Electronics AG
Rosenheimer Strasse 141e
81671 München / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / DOELLGAST, Bernhard
Flurweg 51
8530 Deutschlandsberg / AT
02 / PUFF, Markus
Am Blumenhang 29
8010 Graz / AT
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17728135.931.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP63196
Priority number, dateDE20161011021602.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016110216
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017207654
Date:07.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3465789
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:H01L41/337, H01L41/083, H01L41/107, B24B31/02
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VIELZAHL VON PIEZOELEKTRISCHEN VIELSCHICHTBAUELEMENTEN[2019/15]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLURALITY OF PIEZOELECTRIC MULTILAYER COMPONENTS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE COMPOSANTS MULTICOUCHES PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH08316088  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0011] - [0045]; figures 2,3; examples 2,4-6 *;
 [X]JP2005183477  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] - [0027] - [0039]; figure 1 *;
 [X]JP2010010424  (TDK CORP) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0106]; figures 1,2,4-7; examples 1,2; table 1 *;
 [X]US2013342080  (SUMA KAZUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0033] - [0057]; figures 1,4 *;
 [X]JP2008227314  (TDK CORP) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0031] - [0139]; figures 1-7; example 14; tables 1-3 *;
 [A]DE10205928  (CERAMTEC AG [DE]) [A] 2-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0022]; figures 2,3 *