Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3464467 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3464467



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 436
04.11.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.11.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.11.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.11.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 59
04.11.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 59
03.09.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.06.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
11.06.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
11.06.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
13.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.01.2019 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
28.12.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.12.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.12.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
20.12.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.11.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
30.11.2018 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
19.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 63
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
14.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 60
08.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
08.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
08.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
20.06.2017 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
06.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
06.06.2017 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
06.06.2017 Claims PCT receiving Office 7
06.06.2017 Description PCT receiving Office 51
06.06.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
06.06.2017 Drawings PCT receiving Office 1
06.06.2017 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4
06.06.2017 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 62