Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464467

EP3464467 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A STABILIZER DISPERSION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITION STABILIZED WITH THE STABILIZER DISPERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.11.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INEOS Styrolution Group GmbH
Mainzer Landstrasse 50
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MICHELS, Gisbert
Kuhlmannweg 8
51375 Leverkusen / DE
02 / JANSEN, Ulrich
Stürzelberger Str. 50
41541 Dormagen / DE
03 / EISENTRÄGER, Frank
Mühlenweg 10
50996 Köln / DE
04 / KAMINSKY, Stefan
Richrather Strasse 8
41539 Dormagen / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Jacobi, Markus Alexander
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstraße 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17728188.806.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP63652
Priority number, dateEP2016017309806.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16173098
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211783
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464467
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08L55/02, C08L25/12, C08K5/13, C08K5/372, C08J3/215
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER STABILISATORDISPERSION UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MIT DER STABILISATORDISPERSION STABILISIERTEN THERMOPLASTISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2019/15]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A STABILIZER DISPERSION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITION STABILIZED WITH THE STABILIZER DISPERSION[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE DISPERSION STABILISANTE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION THERMOPLASTIQUE STABILISÉE AVEC LA DISPERSION STABILISANTE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO0123498  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 29, line 16; examples 4,5,7 * * claim - *;
 [AD]EP2949699  (STYROLUTION EUROP GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0376]; example 8 *;
 [A]US2003173544  (EICHENAUER HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0179] - paragraph [0180]; example 16; table 2 * * paragraph [0191] - paragraphs [0209] , [0210]; example 26; table 3 *;
 [A]DE10058135  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0157] - paragraph [0160]; example . * * claim - *
by applicantWO0162848
 WO2008020012
 WO2009071537
 DE19946519
 DE19945519
 EP0669367
 US5196142
 WO0123498
 US4269749
 DE19654169
 WO0123489
 WO0210222
 DE2826925
 EP0022200
 EP0845496
 WO2014170407
 DE102005022632
 WO2014170406
 DE2714544
 DE3000610
 DE3832396
 DE3007934
 DE19907136
    - W. SCHOLTAN; H. LANGE; KOLLOID Z. U. Z, Polymere, (19720000), vol. 250, pages 782 - 796
    - "Dispersionen und Emulsionen: Eine Einfuhrung", G. LAGALY; O. SCHULZ; R. ZIEMEHL, Kolloidik feinverteilter Stoffe einschlieftlich der Tonminerale, Stein-kopf-Verlag, (19970000), pages 279 - 283, ISBN 3-7985-1087-3
    - G. LAGALY; O. SCHULZ; R. ZIEMEHL, Dispersionen und Emulsionen: Eine Einfuhrung in die Kolloidik feinverteilter Stoffe einschliefilich der Tonminerale, Darmstadt: Steinkopf-Verlag, (19970000), page 282, ISBN 3-7985-1087-3