Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472923

EP3472923 - TUBULAR MOTOR FOR A CLOSURE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delta Dore
Le Vieux Chêne
35270 Bonnemain / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / LEMETAYER, Jean-Paul
c/o DELTA DORE
Le Vieux Chêne
35270 Bonnemain / FR
02 / MEINRAD, Hugues
c/o DELTA DORE
Le Vieux Chêne
35270 Bonnemain / FR
03 / ROUTIER, Frédéric
c/o DELTA DORE
Le Vieux Chêne
35270 Bonnemain / FR
04 / DUFEE, Julien
c/o DELTA DORE
Le Vieux Chêne
35270 Bonnemain / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cabinet Le Guen Maillet
3, impasse de la Vigie
CS 71840
35418 Saint-Malo Cedex / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17728238.112.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64274
Priority number, dateFR2016005554515.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655545
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216099
Date:21.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472923
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02K5/22, H02K7/14, H02K15/00, H02K11/33
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ROHRMOTOR FÜR EIN VERSCHLUSSSYSTEM[2019/17]
English:TUBULAR MOTOR FOR A CLOSURE SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:MOTEUR TUBULAIRE POUR UN SYSTÈME D'OBTURATION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
09.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]DE102012203738  (GEZE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]EP1209101  (ITOH ELECTRIC COMPANY LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 1,4 *;
 [X]WO2012094690  (TGW MECHANICS GMBH [AT], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 27, line 7 - page 27, line 28 * * figures 1-10,16,17 *;
 [X]EP1220425  (ASMO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1,2,6,8-15 *