Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465766

EP3465766 - ELECTRIC FIELD SHIELDING IN SILICON CARBIDE METAL-OXIDE-SEMICONDUCTOR (MOS) DEVICE CELLS USING CHANNEL REGION EXTENSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee 
02.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BOLOTNIKOV, Alexander, Viktorovich
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Building K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
02 / LOSEE, Peter, Almern
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Building K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12039 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Dennemeyer & Associates S.A.
Landaubogen 1-3
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Bedford, Grant Richard
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date17728341.323.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US33956
Priority number, dateUS201662340396P23.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662340396 P
US20171559571715.05.2017         Original published format: US201715595717
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205348
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465766
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/78, H01L29/06, H01L29/10
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ABSCHIRMUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEM FELD IN ZELLEN VON SILICIUMCARBID-METALLOXID-HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTEN (MOS) MITTELS KANALREGIONSERWEITERUNGEN[2019/15]
English:ELECTRIC FIELD SHIELDING IN SILICON CARBIDE METAL-OXIDE-SEMICONDUCTOR (MOS) DEVICE CELLS USING CHANNEL REGION EXTENSIONS[2019/15]
French:BLINDAGE DE CHAMP ÉLECTRIQUE DANS DES CELLULES DE DISPOSITIF MÉTAL-OXYDE-SEMI-CONDUCTEUR (MOS) EN CARBURE DE SILICIUM UTILISANT DES EXTENSIONS DE RÉGION DE CANAL[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201903   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2019
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]US2015053999  (KUMAGAI NAOKI [JP]) [X] 1-3,14,15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0052]; figures 2A-3B * [A] 9 [Y] 7,8 [I] 4-6,10-13;
 [XI]US2014367771  (CHATTY KIRAN [US], et al) [X] 1,16,17 * paragraph [0078]; figures 10-14; claim 22 * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0044]; figures 21A-21G * * page 5 - page 6 * [I] 18-20;
 [X]DE112014003637T  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figures 7, 8 * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0091] *;
 [YA]US2011101374  (RYU SEI-HYUNG [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0023]; figure 2 * [A] 9