Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465696

EP3465696 - SYSTEM FOR STORAGE CONTAINER WITH REMOVABLE SHIELD PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.10.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kurion, Inc.
2020 Main Street
Suite 300
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / CAMPBELL, Brett
2020 Main St. 300
Irvine CA 92614 / US
02 / DALTON, David
2020 Main St. 300
Irvine CA 92614 / US
03 / LILLY, Brett
2020 Main St. 300
Irvine CA 92614 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Herre, Peter , et al
Dendorfer & Herrmann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Neuhauser Straße 47
80331 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17728346.223.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34075
Priority number, dateUS201662342028P26.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662342028 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205427
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465696
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G21F5/005
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM FÜR AUFBEWAHRUNGSBEHÄLTER MIT ENTFERNBAREN ABSCHIRMUNGSPLATTEN[2019/15]
English:SYSTEM FOR STORAGE CONTAINER WITH REMOVABLE SHIELD PANELS[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME POUR CONTENEUR DE STOCKAGE AVEC PANNEAUX DE PROTECTION AMOVIBLES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase06.09.2018National basic fee paid 
06.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
06.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2016007200  (ENERGYSOLUTIONS LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-11,16,17 * paragraphs [0010] , [ 299] , [ 292] , [ 281]; figure -; claim 1 * [Y] 4;
 [Y]WO2013036970  (HOLTEC INTERNATIONAL INC [US], et al) [Y] 4 * claim 15 *;
 [A]US2010294960  (FRANK DAVID L [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantUS7211038
 US7429239
 US6283908