Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464460

EP3464460 - THERMOPLASTIC POLYOLEFIN BLENDS INCLUDING BLOCK COMPOSITES AS COMPATIBILIZERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HENSCHKE, Olaf
Bachtobelstrasse 3
8810 Horgen / CH
02 / ZHANG, Yahong
936 Zhangheng Road
Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park
Shanghai 201203 / CN
03 / LI, Wei
936 Zhangheng Road
Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park
Shanghai 201203 / CN
04 / WU, Hang
468 Blvd.
1155 Xinsong Road
Shanghai 201600 / CN
05 / OHMURA, Takahiko
Shibusawa ABC Bldg. 1
5F, Ebisu-cho 1
Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-Shi 221-0024 / JP
06 / HU, Yushan
2301 North Brazosport Blvd.
Freeport, TX 77541 / US
07 / MING, Ming
936 Zhangheng Road
Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park
Shanghai 201203 / CN
08 / JELTSCH, Krischan
Bachtobelstrasse 3
8810 Horgen / CH
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date17728373.624.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34310
Priority number, dateWO2016CN8400431.05.2016         Original published format: PCT/CN2016/084004
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210064
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464460
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/12
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:THERMOPLASTISCHE POLYOLEFINMISCHUNGEN MIT BLOCKVERBUNDSTOFFEN ALS KOMPATIBILISATOREN[2019/15]
English:THERMOPLASTIC POLYOLEFIN BLENDS INCLUDING BLOCK COMPOSITES AS COMPATIBILIZERS[2019/15]
French:MÉLANGES DE POLYOLÉFINE THERMOPLASTIQUE COMPRENANT DES COMPOSITES SÉQUENCÉS COMME AGENTS DE MISE EN COMPATIBILITÉ[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9827154  (ADVANCED ELASTOMER SYSTEMS [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * examples 3,12, 15-18; claim 13 *;
 [X]WO2015057423  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [X] 1-11 * example 1; claim 6 *;
 [X]US2014378601  (JIN YI [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0045]; examples cs2-4,7 example 1-4 *;
 [X]WO2011041696  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * claim 8; tables 22, 26, 28 *;
 [X]WO2004035681  (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0034]; examples 2,3,5,6,8,9 *
by applicantUS2014174509
 US8053529
 US8686087
 US8716400
 US7951882
 US7608668
 WO2009097560
 WO2009097565
 WO2009097525
 WO2009097529
 WO2009097532
 WO2009097535
 US3251905
 US3390207
 US3598887
 US4219627
 US3265765
 US3639521
 US4208356
 US8372931
 US5919983
    - Modern Plastics Encyclopedia/89, (19881000), vol. 65, pages 86 - 92
    - LEE, D.; MILLER, M. D.; MEUNIER, D. M.; LYONS, J. W.; BONNER, J. M.; PELL, R. J.; SHAN, C. L. P.; HUANG, T., J. Chromatogr. A, (20110000), vol. 1218, page 7173
    - BRUN, Y.; FOSTER, P., J. Sep. Sci., (20100000), vol. 33, page 3501
    - WILLIAMS; WARD, J. Polym. Sci., Polym. Let., (19680000), vol. 6, page 621
    - MONRABAL et al., Macromol. Symp., (20070000), vol. 257, pages 71 - 79