Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464206

EP3464206 - MAGNETIZABLE GLASS CERAMIC COMPOSITION AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corning Incorporated
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, New York 14831 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / GROSS, Timothy Michael
49 Summit Avenue
Corning New York 14830 / US
02 / KEECH, John Tyler
3046 S. Oakwood Dr.
Painted Post New York 14870 / US
03 / LYNN, Jeffrey Glenn
21 Summit Street
Tioga Pennsylvania 16946 / US
04 / PENG, Jinlin
14 Timber Lane
Painted Post New York 14870 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date17728378.525.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34368
Priority number, dateUS201662342377P27.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662342377 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205563
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464206
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:C03C10/00, C03B32/02, H01F1/37
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:MAGNETISIERBARE GLASKERAMIKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2019/15]
English:MAGNETIZABLE GLASS CERAMIC COMPOSITION AND METHODS THEREOF[2019/15]
French:COMPOSITION DE VITROCÉRAMIQUE MAGNÉTISABLE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase29.11.2018National basic fee paid 
29.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
29.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US4233169  (BEALL GEORGE H, et al) [A] 1-20 * table 1: ex 20; col. 3, l. 3-col. 6, l. 68; col. 7, l. 23-51; col. 8, l. 21-43; col. 9, l. 1-col. 12, l. 5 *;
 [A]US4084972  (ANDRUS RONALD L, et al) [A] 1-20 * table 1; ex 15; col. 3, l. 29-col. 4, l. 54; col. 8, l. 3-5; col. 9, l. 2-5 *;
 [A]US4126437  (O HORO MICHAEL P) [A] 1-20 * col. 5, l. 26-col. 6, l. 61; example 1 *;
 [A]US4323056  (BORRELLI NICHOLAS F, et al) [A] 1-20 * col. 3, l. 16-col. 4, l. 14; col. 6, l. 11-col. 7, l. 68 *;
 [A]  - SINGH K ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF SIO2-NA2O-FE2O3-CAO-P2O5-B2O3 GLASS CERAMICS", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN MEDICINE, SPRINGER NEW YORK LLC, UNITED STATES, (19990801), vol. 10, no. 8, doi:10.1023/A:1008949025635, ISSN 0957-4530, pages 481 - 484, XP000834649 [A] 1-20 * p. 481: "1. Introduction"-p. 482: "2. Materials and methods" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008949025635
by applicantUS2015239772
 US4140645
 US4083727
 US8637300