Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465502

EP3465502 - MOLECULAR LABEL COUNTING ADJUSTMENT METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cellular Research, Inc.
4040 Campbell Avenue
Suite 110
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / FAN, Jue
4040 Campbell Avenue Suite 110
Menlo Park CA 94025 / US
02 / TSAI, Jennifer
4040 Campbell Avenue Suite 110
Menlo Park CA 94025 / US
03 / SHUM, Eleen
4040 Campbell Avenue Suite 110
Menlo Park CA 94025 / US
04 / DENG, Lisha
4040 Campbell Avenue Suite 110
Menlo Park CA 94025 / US
05 / FU, Glenn, K.
4040 Campbell Avenue Suite 110
Menlo Park CA 94025 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Chapman, Desmond Mark
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17728398.325.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34576
Priority number, dateUS201662342137P26.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662342137 P
US201662381945P31.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662381945 P
US201662401720P29.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662401720 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205691
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465502
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/22, G06F19/24
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER ZÄHLUNG VON MOLEKULAREN MARKIERUNGEN[2019/15]
English:MOLECULAR LABEL COUNTING ADJUSTMENT METHODS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE RÉGLAGE DE COMPTAGE D'ÉTIQUETTES MOLÉCULAIRES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase01.11.2018National basic fee paid 
01.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
01.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
01.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO2015002908  (SEQUENTA INC [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7,38 * par. 7, 91-98, 101, 127, 130 * [A] 2,8-14;
 [YA]US2015119256  (FODOR STEPHEN P A [US] ET AL) [Y] 9,11,12 * par. 193 * [A] 1-8,10,13,14,38
    [XAYI] - Quan Peng ET AL, "Reducing amplification artifacts in high multiplex amplicon sequencing by using molecular barcodes | BMC Genomics | Full Text", (20160311), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20160311141137/http://bmcgenomics.biomedcentral.com/articles/10.1186/s12864-015-1806-8, (20170728), XP055394617 [X] 1-5,7,8,38 * page 2 4th par, page 3 2nd par, page 6 1st, 3rd and 4th par, page 8 last par, page 9 1st par, page 11 3rd par * [A] 13,14 [Y] 9,11,12 [I] 6,10