Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3465502 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3465502



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 755
08.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
08.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 19
08.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
08.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.04.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
04.04.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.03.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
13.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
08.03.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
20.02.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
13.02.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.01.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.12.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
01.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.11.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
08.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
21.12.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 162
21.12.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 122
21.12.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 157
30.11.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
30.11.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 236
04.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
04.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
04.08.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4