Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468958

EP3468958 - SUBSTITUTED OXADIAZOLES FOR COMBATING PHYTOPATHOGENIC FUNGI [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.01.2020
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / WIEBE, Christine
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
02 / TERTERYAN-SEISER, Violeta
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
03 / GRAMMENOS, Wassilios
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
04 / CRAIG, Ian Robert
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
05 / QUINTERO PALOMAR, Maria Angelica
Speyerer Straße 2
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
06 / MENTZEL, Tobias
Speyerer Straße 2
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
07 / FEHR, Marcus
Speyerer Straße 2
63117 Limburgerhof / DE
08 / WINTER, Christian Harald
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
09 / CAMBEIS, Erica
66 Ennerdale Drive
Sale M33 5NE / GB
10 / LOHMANN, Jan Klaas
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwishafen / DE
11 / ESCRIBANO CUESTA, Ana
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
12 / KRETSCHMER, Manuel
1801 16th St. NW Apt. 611
Washington D.C. 20009 / US
13 / GROTE, Thomas
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
14 / MUELLER, Bernd
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)BASF IP Association
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17728496.531.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP63207
Priority number, dateEP2016017371809.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16173718
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211649
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468958
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D271/06, A01N43/82
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE OXADIAZOLE ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG PHYTOPATHOGENER PILZE[2019/16]
English:SUBSTITUTED OXADIAZOLES FOR COMBATING PHYTOPATHOGENIC FUNGI[2019/16]
French:OXADIAZOLES SUBSTITUÉS UTILISÉS POUR LUTTER CONTRE DES CHAMPIGNONS PHYTOPATHOGÈNES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
09.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2015185485  (BASF SE [DE]) [I] 1-12 * claims 1-3, 7-10 * * page 31, line 24 * * page 32, line 3 * * page 32, line 13 * * page 43, line 41 - line 44 * * examples I-96, I-133 *