Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472899

EP3472899 - CONNECTION BLOCK FOR AN ELECTRICAL DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BÖNSCH, Matthias
An der Windflöte 5a
33659 Bielefeld / DE
02 / RICHTS, Jörg
Am Hasenbusch 13
33189 Schlangen / DE
03 / JASCHKE, Bernhard
Oetternbachstr. 27
32791 Lage / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17728540.007.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP63878
Priority number, dateDE201620103277U21.06.2016         Original published format: DE 202016103277 U
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220326
Date:28.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472899
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01R9/26, H01R4/48, H02B1/21, H01R25/14
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ANSCHLUSSBLOCK FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE VERTEILERANLAGE[2019/17]
English:CONNECTION BLOCK FOR AN ELECTRICAL DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:BLOC DE RACCORDEMENT POUR UNE INSTALLATION DE DISTRIBUTION ÉLECTRIQUE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2018National basic fee paid 
02.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
02.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAI]DE202011000137U  (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-6 * * claims 1,6 * * paragraph [0023] * [A] 5 [I] 2-4,6-15;
 [A]DE202010008559U  (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-2e *;
 [A]DE20120811U  (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-8 *