Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472569

EP3472569 - IN SITU AND REAL TIME QUALITY CONTROL IN ADDITIVE MANUFACTU PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.01.2020
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EMPA Eidgenössische Materialprüfungs- und Forschungsanstalt
Überlandstrasse 129
8600 Dübendorf / CH
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / WASMER, Kilian
Outre-Vièze 72
1871 Choex / CH
02 / SHEVCHIK, Sergey
Scheuchzerstrasse 204
8067 Zürich / CH
03 / VAKILI FARAHANI, Farzad
Bächimattstrasse 9
3075 Rüfenacht / CH
04 / VIOLAKIS, Georgios
Lerchenfeldstrasse 43B
3603 Thun / CH
05 / VAUCHER, Sébastien
Hohmadstrasse 7
3600 Thun / CH
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte
Beethovenstrasse 49
Postfach
8027 Zürich / CH
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17728569.909.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64121
Priority number, dateEP2016017451115.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16174511
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216059
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472569
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B29C64/153, G01N29/14, G01N29/22, G01N29/24, G01D5/353, B33Y30/00, G01N29/12, B22F3/105, B29C64/393
[2020/02]
Former International [2019/17]G01D5/353, B22F3/105, B33Y30/00, G01N29/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:IN-SITU- UND ECHTZEIT-QUALITÄTSKONTROLLE IN ADDITIVEM FERTIGUNGSVERFAHREN[2020/02]
English:IN SITU AND REAL TIME QUALITY CONTROL IN ADDITIVE MANUFACTU PROCESS[2019/17]
French:CONTRÔLE QUALITÉ IN SITU ET EN TEMPS RÉEL DANS DES PROCESSUS DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE[2020/02]
Former [2019/17]IN-SITU- UND ECHTZEIT-QUALITÄTSKONTROLLE IN EINEM VERFAHREN ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG
Former [2019/17]CONTRÔLE DE QUALITÉ IN SITU ET EN TEMPS RÉEL DANS UN PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
11.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2016081651  (SIGMA LABS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * Abstract, Desc. [0061]-[0070], [0119]-[0134], Figs. 3a, 20 *;
 [A]CN102680263B  (UNIV TIANJIN) [A] 1-13 * Abstract, Desc. paragraph "technical field", "embodiment 1", Fig. 2 *;
 [A]US2016098825  (DAVE VIVEK R [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * Abstract, Desc. [0003], [0077], [0080], Fig. 23 *;
 [A]  - HAIXI WU ET AL, "In situ monitoring of FDM machine condition via acoustic emission", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ADVANCED MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY., LONDON; GB, (20150917), doi:10.1007/s00170-015-7809-4, ISSN 0268-3768, XP055320139 [A] 1-13 * Col. 4 / l. 15-25, paragraphs 2.2 and 3.3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00170-015-7809-4
by applicantUS5427733
 US5508489
 WO2016081651
 CN102680263
    - ZENG, K.; PAL, D.; STUCKER, B., "A Review of Thermal Analysis Methods in Laser Sintering and Selective Laser Melting", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOLID FREEFORM FABRICATION SYMPOSIUM, (2012), pages 796 - 814
    - KLESZCZYNSKI, S.; ZUR JACOBSMUHLEN, J.; SEHRT, J.; WITT, G., "Error Detection in Laser Beam Melting Systems by High Resolution Imaging", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOLID FREEFORM FABRICATION SYMPOSIUM, (2012), pages 975 - 987
    - DOUBENSKAIA, M.; PAVLOV, M.; CHIVEL, Y., "Optical System for On-line Monitoring and Temperature Control in Selective Laser Melting Technology", KEY ENG. MATER, (2010), vol. 437, pages 458 - 461
    - LONG F.; XUE H., "Research on Signal Analysis Method of Acoustic Emission of Material 2.25Cr-1Mo Based on Wavelet Filter and Clustering", RECENT ADVANCES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE AND INFORMATION ENGINEERING, LECTURE NOTES IN ELECTRICAL ENGINEERING, (2012), vol. 126, pages 821 - 827
    - LYONS R.G., Understanding Digital Signal Processing, (2010), page 11
    - ZHENG J.; SHEN S.; FAN H.; ZHAO J., "An online incremental learning support vector machine for large-scale data", NEURAL COMPUTING AND APPLICATIONS, (2013), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 1023 - 1035
    - JOLLIFFE I.T., Principal Component Analysis, Series: Springer Series in Statistics, SPRINGER, (2002), vol. XXIX, page 28
    - DUDA, R. O.; HART, P. E.; STORK, D. H., Pattern Classification, WILEY INTERSCIENCE
    - GU S; TAN Y.; HE X., "Discriminant analysis via support vectors", NEUROCOMPUTING, (2010), vol. 73, pages 1669 - 1675