Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464263

EP3464263 - POLYMORPHS OF N-[(2,6-DIFLUORO-3-METHOXYPHENYL)METHYL]-3-(METHOXYMETHYL)-1-({4-[(2-OXOPYRIDIN-1-YL)METHYL]PHENYL}METHYL)PYRAZOLE-4-CARBOXAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kalvista Pharmaceuticals Limited
Porton Science Park
Bybrook Road
Porton Down
Wiltshire SP4 0BF / GB
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / CROWE, David Malcolm
5 Boulton Road
Reading RG2 0NH / GB
02 / GILES, Melvyn Edward
29 North Street
Barrow on Soar
Loughborough Leicestershire LE12 8PZ / GB
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)McGuire, Gillian Margaret
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17728595.431.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017GB51548
Priority number, dateGB2016000951931.05.2016         Original published format: GB 201609519
US201662343537P31.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662343537 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207985
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464263
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/10, A61K31/4439, A61P3/00, A61P27/00, A61P29/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:POLYMORPHE VON N-[(2,6-DIFLUOR-3-METHOXYPHENYL)METHYL]-3-(METHOXYMETHYL)-1-({4-[(2-OXOPYRIDIN-1-YL)METHYL]PHENYL}METHYL)PYRAZOL-4-CARBOXAMID[2019/15]
English:POLYMORPHS OF N-[(2,6-DIFLUORO-3-METHOXYPHENYL)METHYL]-3-(METHOXYMETHYL)-1-({4-[(2-OXOPYRIDIN-1-YL)METHYL]PHENYL}METHYL)PYRAZOLE-4-CARBOXAMIDE[2019/15]
French:POLYMORPHES DE N- [(2,6-DIFLUORO-3-MÉTHOXYPHÉNYL) MÉTHYL]-3-(MÉTHOXYMÉTHYLE)-1-({4-[(2-OXOPYRIDIN-1-YL)MÉTHYL]PHÉNYL}MÉTHYL)PYRAZOLE-4-CARBOXAMIDE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase31.12.2018National basic fee paid 
31.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
31.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
31.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2013111108  (NOVARTIS AG [CH]) [AD] 1-30 * page 26, paragraph 6 - page 27, paragraph 1; examples 15,16; claims 1,5,10-15 *;
 [AD]WO2014108679  (KALVISTA PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-30 * claims 1,3,17-23; table 8; compound 89 *;
 [A]WO2014188211  (KALVISTA PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-30 * examples 113,126,129; claims 1,20,23-29 *;
 [IDP]WO2016083820  (KALVISTA PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [GB]) [IDP] 7-20,25-30 * compound 66 in Table 7 on page 66, on page 79 and pharmaceutical data given for compound 66 on page 98;; claims 1,10-17 *