Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465730

EP3465730 - DATA DIRECTED DESI-MS IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micromass UK Limited
Stamford Avenue
Altrincham Road
Wilmslow SK9 4AX / GB
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Emrys
16 Cranmer Road
Didsbury Manchester M20 6AW / GB
02 / CHAPMAN, Richard
1302 Windsor Ridge Drive
Westborough, MA 01581 / GB
03 / PRINGLE, Steven Derek
Linden Cottages
Temple
Norton Cross Darwen BB3 3PS / GB
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date17728628.305.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017GB51604
Priority number, dateGB2016000974703.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201609747
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017208025
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465730
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01J49/00, H01J49/14, H01J49/16
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:DATENGESTEUERTE DESI-MS-BILDGEBUNG[2019/15]
English:DATA DIRECTED DESI-MS IMAGING[2019/15]
French:IMAGERIE PAR SPECTROMÉTRIE DE MASSE À DÉSORPTION-IONISATION PAR ÉLECTRONÉBULISATION (DESI) GUIDÉE PAR DONNÉES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2018National basic fee paid 
29.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
29.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2016155620  (MAKAROV ALEXANDER A [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,11-23 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0037]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0047] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0060] * [I] 9,10;
 [X]  - Emmanuelle Claude ET AL, "Multiple, Sequential DESI Images from a Single Tissue Section at Different Spatial Resolution", (20150318), URL: http://maldi-msi.org/wp/wp-content/uploads/2015/03/Multiple-sequential%20DESI%20images.pdf, (20170727), XP055394423 [X] 1,2,4 * pages 1, 2; figure 1 *
 [X]  - TAKÁTS ZOLTÁN ET AL, "Ambient mass spectrometry using desorption electrospray ionization (DESI): instrumentation, mechanisms and applications in forensics, chemistry, and biology", JOURNAL OF MASS SPECTROMETRY, WILEY, CHICHESTER, GB, (20051001), vol. 40, no. 10, doi:10.1002/JMS.922, ISSN 1076-5174, pages 1261 - 1275, XP002453244 [X] 22,23 * page 1266; figure 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jms.922
 [A]  - Emmanuelle Claude ET AL, "Generation of Multiple Images from a Single Tissue Section with Dual Polarity Desorption Electrospray Ionization Mass Spectrometry", (20150318), URL: http://maldi-msi.org/wp/wp-content/uploads/2015/03/DESI-Generation%20of%20multiple%20images.pdf, (20170727), XP055394429 [A] 9 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DAHLIA I CAMPBELL ET AL, "Improved spatial resolution in the imaging of biological tissue using desorption electrospray ionization", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20120616), vol. 404, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S00216-012-6173-6, ISSN 1618-2650, pages 389 - 398, XP035083683 [A] 10 * page 391, column l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-012-6173-6