blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3465730 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780024383 EP17728628



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019304768Global Dossier 03.10.2019A1
Priority number Date
GB201609747 03.06.2016
WO2017GB51604 05.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109075013Global Dossier 21.12.2018A
Priority number Date
GB201609747 03.06.2016
WO2017GB51604 05.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3465730Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
GB201609747 03.06.2016
WO2017GB51604 05.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017208025Global Dossier 07.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
GB201609747 03.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB201609747D 20.07.2016D0
Priority number Date
GB201609747 03.06.2016