Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465659

EP3465659 - AIRCRAFT CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, So, Young
2623 Camino Ramon
San Ramon CA 94583 / US
02 / CARROLL, Alexander, Kaber
2623 Camino Ramon
San Ramino CA 94583 / US
03 / OVENS, Norman, Leonard
3290 Patterson Avenue
Grand Rapids MI 49512 / US
04 / GREEN, Sharon, Ann
3925 Gateway Centre Boulevard
Pinellas Park FL 33782 / US
05 / COOPER, Jennifer, Ruth
2623 Camino Ramon
San Ramon CA 94583 / US
06 / FIGARD, Michael, Eric
3290 Patterson Avenue
Grand Rapids MI 49512 / US
07 / MURUGAPPAN, Sundar
2623 Camino Ramon
San Ramon CA 94583 / US
08 / SOLIZ, Boris
2623 Camino Ramon
San Ramon CA 94583 / US
09 / AKIYAMA, Masaki, Merritt
2623 Camino Ramon
San Ramon CA 94583 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Williams, Andrew Richard
GE International Inc.
GPO-Europe The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date17728720.824.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34155
Priority number, dateUS20161516459125.05.2016         Original published format: US201615164591
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017205455
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465659
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G08G5/00, G01C23/00, G06F3/00, G06F11/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:FLUGZEUGSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM[2019/15]
English:AIRCRAFT CONTROL SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE D'AVION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2007150119  (MITCHELL BRADLEY J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-11,13,15,20 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * [I] 3-5,8,12,14,16-19;
 [XI]US5522026  (RECORDS ROGER M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-11,13,15,20 * abstract * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 39 * * column 13, line 30 - column 14, line 10 * [I] 3-5,8,12,14,16-19;
 [XI]US6262720  (JEFFREY GARY S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-11,13,15,20 * abstract * * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 45 * * column 5, line 33 - line 60 * * column 10, line 66 - column 12, line 6 * [I] 3-5,8,12,14,16-19;
 [I]US2012218127  (KROEN CHRISTOPHER FINLEY [US]) [I] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0129] *