Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464577

EP3464577 - NOVEL AMYLASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  20.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HERBST, Daniela
Adlerstr. 6
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / MUSSMANN, Nina
Am Kuhbusch 109
47877 Willich / DE
03 / O'CONNELL, Timothy
Mehlbeerenstr. 10
86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE
04 / LINDNER, Claudia
Thomastraße 15
42719 Solingen / DE
05 / KRÜGER, Anna
Schotstek 1
21129 Hamburg / DE
06 / MEYER, Neele
Am Alten Bauhof 8
21339 Lüneburg / DE
07 / ANTRANIKIAN, Garabed
Schafkovengrund 3
21218 Seevetal-Hittfeld / DE
08 / PETERS, Anke
Nenndorfer Str. 4
21224 Rosengarten / DE
 [2019/15]
Application number, filing date17728806.501.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP63310
Priority number, dateDE20161020988006.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016209880
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211678
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464577
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/26, C11D3/386
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:NEUE AMYLASEN[2019/15]
English:NOVEL AMYLASES[2019/15]
French:NOUVELLES AMYLASES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase26.10.2018National basic fee paid 
26.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
26.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2014164777  (DANISCO US INC [US]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0213] - paragraph [0231] * * claims 1-55 *
 [XYI]  - "RecName: Full=Alpha-amylase {ECO:0000256|RuleBase:RU361134}; EC=3.2.1.1 {ECO:0000256|RuleBase:RU361134};", UniProt, (20111019), Database accession no. G0GBA9, URL: EBI, XP055392492 [X] 2 * the whole document * [Y] 1-11 [I] 5,6,9
 [Y]  - LONG-LIU LIN ET AL, "Production and properties of a raw-starch-degrading amylase from the thermophilic and alkaliphilic Bacillus sp. TS-23", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND APPLIED BIOCHEMI, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, (19980101), vol. 28, no. 1, ISSN 0885-4513, pages 61 - 68, XP009111923 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *